MA H1315 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5089
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to preserve affordable housing through a local option tenant's right to purchase. Housing.
Title
To preserve affordable housing through a local option tenant's right to purchase
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5089 |
2019-12-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2 |
2019-12-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S802 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1273 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
S2389 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H5089 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1263 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S804 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H1273 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H3696 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2020
S2389 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H5089 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1315 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1315.pdf |