MA H1353 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to cities and towns sheltering individuals for certain state or federal housing agencies. Housing.
Title
Providing relief of 40B regulations for municipalities sheltering individuals on behalf of DHCD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-04 | House | No further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S1321 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
S1686 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - House concurred
S1759 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1686 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - House concurred
S1759 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1353 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1353.pdf |