MA H1362 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Montaño of Boston, a petition of Samantha Montaño, Lindsay N. Sabadosa and Mindy Domb that the Department of Housing and Community Development provide for programs, policies, guidelines, priorities and preferences for the housing of formerly incarcerated persons reentering communities. Housing.
Title
To secure housing for returning citizens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-03-04 | House | No further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S878 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4138 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4234 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4553 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted
S2744 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
H4138 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4234 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4553 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted
S2744 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1362 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1362.pdf |