MA H1403 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate clerk magistrate hearings. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to transparency in clerk magistrate hearings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3566 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/20/2023 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2427 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4109 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - House Committee of conference membership changed (Gregoire-Fluker Oakley-Kane).
S2427 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4109 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - House Committee of conference membership changed (Gregoire-Fluker Oakley-Kane).
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1403 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1403.pdf |