MA H1545 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the elimination of the requirement to provide notice to the Department of Mental Health of a license granted to guardians to sell real estate. The Judiciary.
Title
Removing the requirement to provide notice to the department of mental health of a license granted to a guardian to sell real estate
Sponsors
Rep. John Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-09-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1738 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1339 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1698 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1719 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied S1153
S1135 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S147 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1947 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1163 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1339 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1698 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1719 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied S1153
S1135 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S147 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1947 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1163 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1545 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1545.pdf |