MA H1610 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5086

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 127-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent wage theft, promote employer accountability, and enhance public enforcement. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent wage theft, promote employer accountability, and enhance public enforcement

Sponsors

Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]
Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Christopher Markey [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Aaron Michlewitz [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Sen. Mark Montigny [D]
Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. James Murphy [D]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. David Nangle [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Jerald Parisella [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]
Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]
Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. William Straus [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Sen. John Velis [D]
Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Joseph Wagner [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]
Rep. Bud Williams [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-29HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H5086
2020-10-08SenateSenate concurred
2020-06-02HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday October 27, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-05SenateSenate concurred
2020-01-30HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-05-06JointHearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S1066 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
H5086 (Replaced by) 2020-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback