MA H1770 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting child sex dolls. The Judiciary.
Title
Prohibiting child sex dolls
Sponsors
Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Alan Silvia [D] |
Rep. Marcus Vaughn [R] | Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2191 (Similar To) 2023-11-03 - Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H2057 (Similar To) 2023-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H4200 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2057 (Similar To) 2023-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H4200 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1770 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1770.pdf |