MA H1796 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to telephone service for inmates in correctional institutions. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to telephone service for inmates in all correctional and other penal institutions in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1481 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2773
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1796 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1796.pdf |