MA H1881 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect hospital workers from being deprived of their wages. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Clarifying the wage act to protect hospital workers from being deprived of their wages
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Garlick [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. John Barrett [D] | Rep. Carol Doherty [D] |
Rep. James O'Day [D] | Rep. Rodney Elliott [D] | Rep. Kevin Honan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 3, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2024-01-25 | House | Accompanied by S1177 |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-09-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1177 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied H1881
S1698 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
S1161 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Reporting date extended to Monday June 10, 2024, pending concurrence
S1698 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
S1161 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Reporting date extended to Monday June 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1881 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1881.pdf |