MA H1896 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modify weekly workers' compensation disability benefits. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To modify weekly workers' compensation disability benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1898 (Similar To) 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1897 (Similar To) 2023-09-28 - Accompanied S1159
S1172 (Similar To) 2023-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1897 (Similar To) 2023-09-28 - Accompanied S1159
S1172 (Similar To) 2023-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1896 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1896.pdf |