MA H1960 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to study and report on the policies and procedures of the Department of Unemployment Assistance to prevent and address unemployment fraud. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to the prevention of unemployment fraud
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H3123 (Similar To) 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2480 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2578 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2480 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2578 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1960 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1960.pdf |