MA H2040 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the care and sale of cats, dogs and rabbits. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To protect pets
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Cusack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2040 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2040.pdf |