MA H2233 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a physical therapy licensure compact. Public Health.
Title
Establishing a physical therapy licensure compact
Sponsors
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D] | Rep. Rady Mom [D] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Rep. Simon Cataldo [D] |
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 3, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-09-18 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S187 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
H352 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
H352 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2233 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2233.pdf |