MA H2469 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt disabled veterans from the motor vehicle leasing sales tax. Revenue.
Title
Exempting disabled veterans from sales tax when leasing a motor vehicle
Sponsors
Rep. William Galvin [D] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] |
Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] | Rep. Theodore Speliotis [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2956 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2469 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2469.pdf |