MA H248 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Accompanied S149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Accompanied S149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disclosure of toxic chemicals in children’s products. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the disclosure of toxic chemicals in children’s products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | Senate | Accompanied S149 |
2019-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S519 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S149 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1400 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S464 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3661 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S149 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1400 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S464 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3661 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H248 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H248.pdf |