MA H2579 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing Kenneth M. Antanavica to continue to serve as police chief in the town of Leicester. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the position of police chief in the town of Leicester
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2023 | |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-04-27 | House | Enacted |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-04-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-03-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-03-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-03-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-03-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2571 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2023
H4072 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2024
S2746 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - House concurred
H4072 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2024
S2746 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2579 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2579.pdf |