MA H2581 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the retirement benefits of certain employees of the Department of Transitional Assistance and the Department of Housing and Community Development. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the retirement benefits of certain employees of the Department of Transitional Assistance and the Department of Housing and Community Development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3891 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2581 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2581.pdf |