MA H2730 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Concord be authorized to establish a real estate transfer fee upon the transfer of property in said town. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing a real estate transfer fee upon the transfer of property in the town of Concord
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2037 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H664 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H4200 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H664 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H4200 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2730 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2730.pdf |