MA H2778 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-18 - Consolidated with H4483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-18 - Consolidated with H4483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town council and the school committee of the city known as the town of Greenfield be authorized to submit certain measures to the voters of said city. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to elections in the city known as the town of Greenfield
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-18 | House | Consolidated with H4483 |
2018-04-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-04-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-04-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-05-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S365 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S398 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S377 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S380 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H2705 (Similar To) 2017-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2017
H3656 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H390 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2087 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2069 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2589
H377 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H380 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H4981 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S398 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S377 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S380 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H2705 (Similar To) 2017-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2017
H3656 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H390 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2087 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2069 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2589
H377 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H380 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H4981 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2778 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2778.pdf |