MA H2874 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the taxation of accessible dwellings for older adults and people with disabilities. Revenue.
Title
Promoting accessible dwellings for older adults and people with disabilities to remain in their communities
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2874 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2874.pdf |