MA H2883 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the collection, assignment or transfer of delinquent property taxes by cities and towns. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the improvement in the process for collecting delinquent municipal property taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1772 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S1914 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H2978 (Similar To) 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1914 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H2978 (Similar To) 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2883 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2883.pdf |