MA H2943 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to excise taxes on motor vehicles for low-income veterans. Revenue.
Title
Relative to tax relief for low-income veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H42 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H2942 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H4162 (Similar To) 2023-11-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2942 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H4162 (Similar To) 2023-11-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2943 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2943.pdf |