MA H3208 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 77-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Resolutions reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Messrs. Gentile of Sudbury and Vieira of Falmouth, a petition of Carmine Lawrence Gentile, David T. Vieira and others for the adoption of resolutions memorializing the Congress of the United States to call for a convention to propose amendments in order to address concerns about the integrity of our elections and the ability of the people to participate in effective self-government. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolutions for a United States constitutional amendment and a limited amendment proposing convention

Sponsors

Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. David Vieira [R]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. James Kelcourse [R]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]
Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. James O'Day [D]
Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]
Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]Rep. Bud Williams [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseResolutions reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-08-30JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H1302 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H82 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
H79 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
S428 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H656 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S406 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H653 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S14 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
S414 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H2445 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2211 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3860 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2275 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2019
H3936 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2290 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H4034 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4058 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback