MA H3209 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the location and classification of certain renewable energy generating sources in relation to their proximity to environmental justice communities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Ensuring a healthy future for environmental justice communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H914 (Similar To) 2023-09-14 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H789 (Similar To) 2023-09-14 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3374 (Similar To) 2023-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H2014 (Similar To) 2023-09-24 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H789 (Similar To) 2023-09-14 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3374 (Similar To) 2023-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H2014 (Similar To) 2023-09-24 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3209 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3209.pdf |