MA H3211 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 20, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 20, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to limiting the eligibility of woody biomass as an alternative energy supply. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Limiting the eligibility of woody biomass as an alternative energy supply
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 20, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2137 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - House concurred
S2136 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - House concurred
H3210 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 20, 2024, pending concurrence
S2136 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - House concurred
H3210 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 20, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3211 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3211.pdf |