MA H3267 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Somerville be authorized to employ automated enforcement of speed limit violations in designated safety zones within said city. Transportation. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the City of Somerville to employ automated enforcement of speed limit violations in designated safety zones within the City of Somerville
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3969 (Similar To) 2023-12-07 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4205
H4074 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
S2545 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H4465 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4074 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
S2545 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H4465 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3267 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3267.pdf |