MA H341 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for the distribution of lottery funds to cities and towns in direct proportion to the total revenues accruing from lottery sales in each such municipality. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the distribution of revenues accruing from the sale of lottery tickets

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H290 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H219 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H254 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H289 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1826 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2668 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H2961 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
S216 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback