MA H3598 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to wireless transmissions to and from motor vehicles. Transportation.
Title
Relative to wireless transmissions from motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-07-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2348 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3537 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1574 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
S194 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2353 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2316 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1591 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2889
H471 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H3537 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1574 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
S194 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2353 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2316 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1591 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2889
H471 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3598 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3598.pdf |