MA H3640 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Nantucket be authorized to designate the Nantucket Housing Authority as the agency authorized to create, administer and enforce housing needs covenants in said town. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the act authorizing affordable housing convenants in the town of Nantucket
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-04-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 437 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S445 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H777 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied S445
H1320 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3954 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
S445 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H777 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied S445
H1320 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3954 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3640 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3640.pdf |