MA H3655 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4455
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the harmful distribution of sexually explicit visual material.
Title
Relative to the harmful distribution of sexually explicit visual material
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4455 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-03-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 2, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 21, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-11-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3653 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3925
H3656 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H57 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Placed on file
H1 (Similar To) 2017-04-10 - Reported in part, see H3600
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
S2065 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2017
S2064 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2017
H3671 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3675 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - See H3450
H318 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4603
H4455 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3656 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H57 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Placed on file
H1 (Similar To) 2017-04-10 - Reported in part, see H3600
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
S2065 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2017
S2064 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2017
H3671 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3675 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - See H3450
H318 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4603
H4455 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3655 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3655.pdf |