MA H369 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Economic Development and Emerging Technologies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the commercial fishing, shellfish and seafood industries. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To strategically plan for the commercial fishing industry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-05JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in The Gloucester House
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

H2643 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback