MA H3724 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Foxborough be authorized to change the name of the board of selectmen to the select board. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to changing the Board of Selectmen in the Town of Foxborough
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-03-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-12-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-12-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-12-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-11-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2233 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3724 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3724.pdf |