MA H3742 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Somerville be authorized to provide voting rights in municipal elections for certain residents aged 16 and 17 years old. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Granting the City of Somerville the authority to provide legal voting rights in municipal elections for City of Somerville residents aged 16 and 17 years old
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H4023 (Similar To) 2023-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2023
H4203 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S2544 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2024
H4203 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S2544 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3742 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3742.pdf |