MA H3803 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a public safety building authority and assistance program. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Establishing a public safety building authority and assistance program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2023-04-21 | House | Returned from the Secretary of State |
2023-03-23 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
Same As/Similar To
H792 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4143 (Similar To) 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4143 (Similar To) 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3803 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3803.pdf |