MA H3810 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4578
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to motor vehicle warranties. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to motor vehicle repair notification
Sponsors
Rep. John Scibak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4578 |
2015-11-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-10-14 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2015-10-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4578 (Replaced by) 2016-08-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H944 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1032 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2056 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H945 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H943 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H944 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1032 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2056 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H945 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H943 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3810 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3810.pdf |