MA H3823 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to travel mileage rate fees for sheriffs, deputy sheriffs and constables. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to travel mileage rate fees for sheriffs, deputy sheriffs and constables
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-05-01 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3823 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3823.pdf |