MA H3876 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Chelmsford be authorized to restrict certain motor vehicles from traveling on Ledge Road in said town. Transportation. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Restricting the weight of motor vehicles along Ledge Road in the town of Chelmsford
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 23, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-05-25 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3706 (Similar To) 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H4179 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4179 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3876 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3876.pdf |