MA H3895 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing redivision of merger lots in municipalities adopting NetZero code. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to allowing redivision of merger lots in municipalities adopting NetZero code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-06-08 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3895 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3895.pdf |