MA H3922 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to preventing false confessions. The Judiciary.
Title
Preventing false confessions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-06-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1295 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
S106 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1514 (Similar To) 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3054 (Similar To) 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1329 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S106 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1514 (Similar To) 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3054 (Similar To) 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1329 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3922 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3922.pdf |