MA H3924 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to remove the prohibition on rent control and to provide tenant and foreclosure protections. Housing.
Title
Enabling local options for tenant protections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday May 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-12-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2 |
2019-12-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3924 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3924.pdf |