MA H396 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting price gouging of goods, services and supplies during a declared public health emergency. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
In relation to prohibiting price gouging with respect to goods, services and supplies during a declared public health emergency
Sponsors
Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] |
Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Rodney Elliott [D] | Rep. Marcus Vaughn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2207 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S1461 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
S1461 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H396 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H396.pdf |