MA H3970 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Kiera C. McNamara, an employee of the Trial Court. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Kiera C. McNamara, an employee of the Trial Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-09-16 | House | Enacted |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-09-16 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-09-16 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2019-09-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading) adopted |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Read third (title changed) |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-08-15 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2019-07-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-07-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-07-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-07-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-07-10 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2019-06-20 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3744 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2019
H3693 (Similar To) 2019-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2019
H3975 (Similar To) 2019-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 146 of the Acts of 2019
H4215 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
H4251 (Similar To) 2020-04-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2020
H3693 (Similar To) 2019-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2019
H3975 (Similar To) 2019-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 146 of the Acts of 2019
H4215 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
H4251 (Similar To) 2020-04-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3970 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3970.pdf |