MA H4026 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1621
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on August 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing benefits for permanent functional loss and disfigurement under the Worker's Compensation Act
Title
Providing benefits for permanent functional loss and disfigurement under the Worker's Compensation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-08-05 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-08-05 | House | New draft of H1621 and H1636 |
2019-08-05 | House | Reported from the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1621 (Replaces) 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4026
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
H1638 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
H1638 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4026 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4026.pdf |