MA H4037 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-29 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-29 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the transfer of certain parcels of land in the town of Cohasset for general municipal purposes and for telecommunications leases and easements. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to certain parcels of land in the town of Cohasset
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-27 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-11-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-11-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-10-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-08-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-08-03 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4045 (Similar To) 2023-12-12 - Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4077 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4174 (Similar To) 2024-01-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4448 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Laid before the Governor
H4077 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4174 (Similar To) 2024-01-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4448 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Laid before the Governor
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4037 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4037.pdf |