MA H4075 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 218 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 218 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the conveyance of a certain parcel of land in the town of Northborough. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the Town of Northborough to Convey Certain Parklands to Abutters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 218 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #284 [37 YEAS to 0 NAYS] |
2012-07-30 | House | Enacted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 335) |
2012-07-27 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2012-07-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-07-25 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-07-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-07-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-06-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-05-09 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4075 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=117684&generalCourtId=1 |