MA H4360 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2821
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish standards for medical gas piping systems
Title
To establish standards for medical gas piping systems
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2018-04-04 | House | New draft of H2821 |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2821 (Replaces) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4360
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4360 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4360.pdf |