MA H4428 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Kafka of Stoughton, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 417). June 23, 2016.
Title
Improving students' access to life saving treatments
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Kafka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-07 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-06-23 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2016-06-23 | House | Substituted for H417 |
Same As/Similar To
H1416 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1984 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1848 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4733 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 391 of the Acts of 2016
H1984 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1848 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4733 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 391 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4428 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4428.pdf |