MA H4527 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3033
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1-1)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the special commission on state institutions for persons with disabilities
Title
Relative to the special commission on state institutions for persons with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-04-03 | House | New draft of H3033 |
2024-04-03 | House | Pending new draft of H3033 |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3033 (Replaces) 2024-04-03 - New draft substituted, see H4527
S1965 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2866 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H3088 (Similar To) 2023-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2002 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
S1965 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2866 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H3088 (Similar To) 2023-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2002 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4527 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4527.pdf |