MA H4561 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3987
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to retired fire fighters in the city of Newton
Title
Relative to retired fire fighters in the city of Newton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-04-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-04-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-04-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-04-22 | House | New draft of H3987 |
2024-04-22 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3987 (Replaces) 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4561
S1715 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2550 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1715 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2550 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4561 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4561.pdf |