MA H4629 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 381 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 381 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Stoneham be authorized to amend the charter of said town to change the name of the board of selectmen. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the charter of the town of Stoneham to change the name of the board of selectmen
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 381 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second an ordered to a third reading |
2018-08-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-06-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-06-18 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1097 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3930
S1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2018
H2423 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2018
H3725 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2018
S2144 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2018
H4948 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 341 of the Acts of 2018
S2682 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4948
S2700 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2018
H2423 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2018
H3725 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2018
S2144 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2018
H4948 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 341 of the Acts of 2018
S2682 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4948
S2700 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4629 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4629.pdf |